Governing document THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUG 1901, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 31 MAR 1949 AND 22 JUL 2010 (RECORDED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 5 AUG 2010). AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND PROMOTE THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD AND TO CARRY ON AND FURTHER OPERATIONS AND MEASURES IN CONNECTION WITH SAID CHURCH, OR DESIGNED TO CARRY OUT ANY OF ITS OBJECTS OR PURPOSES
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.