Trustees WELLINGBOROUGH CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 264158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Clare Donaldson | Chair | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bonnie Killingback | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sydney Parnell | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ROY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Shashikant Dholakia MBE | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Egerton Hubbard | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Burgoyne | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Isabel Traxton | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edeltraud Hedwig Freund | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT TOWNSON | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT DAVEY WHARTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JUDITH THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.