Trustees THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SOUTH ASIAN STUDIES
Charity number: 264591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arvind Kumar | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sadiq Bhanbhro | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Priyanka Singh | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dibyadyuti Roy | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christophe Jaffrelot | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jahnavi Phalkey | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Priyanka Basu | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Professor Anand Prathivadi Bhayankaram | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sunil Mitra Kumar | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anindita Ghosh | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Deana Heath | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Eyre | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Chambers | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR JOHN ZAVOS | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.