Trustees CONTACT A FAMILY
Charity number: 284912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Riach | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Kathleen Roseann Fleck | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Sladdin | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Timothy Peter Clarkson | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Persephone Sutherland Church | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Gyllian Kathryn Curtis-Machin | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jamileh Tufail | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Eleanor Sriyani Jayawardane Christie | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Leach | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Angela Kitching | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
James Holmes | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.