Governance UNITED CHRISTIAN BROADCASTERS LIMITED
Charity number: 299128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 26 April 1988: Standard registration
- 10 February 2023: Funds received from 1154179 LIFE KEYS
- 16 February 2023: Funds received from 1055406 THE SANCTUARY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 11 October 2023: Funds received from 1178711 NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- 19 December 2023: Funds received from 1106584 IDUMU OKAKE ASSOCIATION
- 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 515572 JEZREEL NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- UCB EUROPE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.