Trustees ROCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS CHARITY
Charity number: 307839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH ANN TURPIN | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Russell John Race | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Sarah Florence Earle | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
rosemary dymond | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
ANN AMELIA WEST MBE,JP,DL | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Teresa Murray | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
MR STUART SMITH | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Elaine Marie Gardner | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.