Trustees BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST
Charity number: 312516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE CREASY | Chair | 18 May 2018 |
|
|||||
David Crowther | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Nick Tesseyman | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Suela Aksoy | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr John Mathenge Kanyaru | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Anood Al-Samerai | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Janice Miller | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Cashman | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOY PALMER COOPER | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BARON | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.