Trustees BRITISH INSTITUTE IN EASTERN AFRICA
Charity number: 1061622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Justin Willis | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vinodrai Gordhandas Mandavia | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sada Mire | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Wale Adebanwi | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharath Srinivasan | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Emma Hunter | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ambreena Manji | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor Victor Murinde | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ceri Ashley | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rt Hon Mr Mark Jonathan Mortlock Simmonds | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIR JEFFREY RUSSELL JAMES KBE CMG | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor GABRIELLE MARY LYNCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.