Governing document SURREY WELFARE RIGHTS UNIT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18 MARCH 1997 as amended on 24 Nov 1999 as amended on 14 Oct 2005 as amended on 13 Dec 2010 as amended on 18 Feb 2019 as amended on 01 Aug 2019 as amended on 24 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
To promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress, primarily but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in Surrey.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.