Dogfen lywodraethu THE FERRY PROJECT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 MAR 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUL 2021 as amended on 06 Sep 2022 as amended on 06 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING, BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION AND EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL COUNTIES OF NORFOLK LINCOLNSHIRE AND CAMBRIDGESHIRE. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL COUNTIES OF NORFOLK LINCOLNSHIRE AND CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Maes buddion
NORFOLK, LINCOLNSHIRE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.