Trustees National Fire Chiefs Council Limited
Charity number: 1074071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shantha Dickinson | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Ross | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Richard Wood | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Catherine Elizabeth Skinner | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Francis Stout | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Louise Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Fraser Haggart | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Dudley Roe | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Mitchell Bowcock | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Simon Thomas | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.