Governing document THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1947 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 1958, 25 FEBRUARY 1967, 24 FEBRUARY 1996, 22 JANUARY 2000, 11 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 21 MARCH 2009. as amended on 03 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF THE ART OF MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO LITURGICAL AND ORGAN MUSIC (WHETHER WRITTEN FOR CHURCH OR CONCERT HALL).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GLOUCESTERSHIRE, VARIOUS CHURCHES, CHURCH HALLS AND CATHEDRALS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.