Trustees GROUP FOR EDUCATION IN MUSEUMS
Charity number: 1090995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE MARCUS | Chair | 04 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Anne Holme | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karin Molson | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Almeida | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Paul Macey | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hill | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben James Pearce | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cowie | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BRUCE | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathyrn Moore | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.