Governing document L&NWR SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED 21 MAY 2005. AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2012 as amended on 09 Jun 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2019 as amended on 24 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE LONDON AND NORTH WESTERN RAILWAY , INCLUDING THE STUDY AND PRESERVATION OF INFORMATION, DRAWINGS, PHOTOGRAPHS, MODELS AND OTHER MATERIAL PERTAINING TO THE RAILWAY COMPANY AND RELATED ORGANISATIONS AND SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.