Governance OPEN DOORS WITH BROTHER ANDREW
Charity number: 1125684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 02 September 2008: Standard registration
- 23 June 2011: Funds received from 260600 OPEN DOORS WITH BROTHER ANDREW
- 15 July 2018: Funds received from 1052557 MEXBOROUGH NEW LIFE CHURCH
- 20 July 2018: Funds received from 1030038 CHRISTINE AND HELEN CHARITABLE TRUST
- 03 January 2023: Funds received from 1140188 HITCHIN CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY
- 17 January 2023: Funds received from 702516 THE WOOLHOPE TRUST
- 16 February 2023: Funds received from 1055406 THE SANCTUARY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 19 September 2023: Funds received from 1163762 TURKIC BELT MINISTRIES
- 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 515572 JEZREEL NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.