Trustees ALFORD HOUSE
Charity number: 1123902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas John Priestnall | Chair | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Walsh | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toba Shittu | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beejal Chandaria | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Byron Bond | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Blake Carter-White | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Edward Shaw | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lloyd | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
William James Maunder Taylor | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bickerdike | Trustee | 22 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
PETER MACKELCAN WOODROFFE | Trustee | 07 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY FLETCHER DE VERE GREEN | Trustee | 03 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
JANE SANCHEZ | Trustee | 03 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
JANET ROSEMARY WELLS BA | Trustee | 03 March 2008 |
|
|||||
NIGEL BAKER | Trustee | 03 March 2008 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.