Trustees CULLERCOATS WATCH HOUSE
Charity number: 1126835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER ELIZABETH FLINT | Trustee | 29 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Thomas David Parrish | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
PAUL ALAN BROWN | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
NICOLA SCORER | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
HELEN MARY WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael English | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Daniel Humphreys | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
GEORGE EDWARD HARRISON | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
FRANCIS GEORGE TAYLOR | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID HODGSON | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.