Trustees THE GOODMAN AND RUTHIN CHARITY
Charity number: 1126422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
zoe henderson | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev luke Bristowe | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Martin Goldstein | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Gregory Kenneth Cameron | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Huw Bryant | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Barrie | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Gwynne Jones | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Snape | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Morfudd Jones | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev NIGEL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 18 May 2012 |
|
|||||||
Lady SUSAN HUDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.