Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH - CLEVELAND AND DANBY CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1130868
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
43 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yuonne Holden | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Sands | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Burdon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kevin Highfield | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Jason Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Sandra Dixon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Dixon | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Crossman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev William Middlemiss | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Darby | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Anderson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
SHEILA JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Hathaway | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Mary Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Isabel Ann Stuart | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Beryl Hurren | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Michael Callaghan | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tim Husbands | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Henry | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Chester | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Stephenson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Coles | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Harrison | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
REV KEITH WILLIAM MARTIN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Taylor | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jonathan Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN PEARSON | Trustee | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
ENA HARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Chadwick | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN SOUTHGATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAWRENCE ERNEST PEIRSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN ELIZABETH WOODHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER PELLANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN COATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE ANN FOSTER-HARDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT EDWARD NEWLOVE SHAWCROSS FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SIMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ANN TANSLEY CERT.ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN RICHMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV TREVOR HAIGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN SHELAGH PELLANT BA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.