Trustees THE ASSOCIATION FOR SCIENCE AND DISCOVERY CENTRES
Charity number: 1129312
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr STEPHEN GERARD BRESLIN | Chair | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laurence George Butler | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Paul Giordano McTiffin | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David Bull | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Joudi | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sheila Pearson | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Savita Anne Willmott | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Chambers | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Alun Snelling | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Denoon | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Quinton-Tulloch | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donna Speed-Grenfell | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hermione Anne Phoebe Cockburn | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
TUDOR GWYNN | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Mary Holligan | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ST HILL BISHOP | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.