Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FETCHAM
Charity number: 1128915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD DAVID FURZE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
VALERIE JEAN HAMMOMD | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY PAUL GASKILL | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE ALEXANDER CALLANDER | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANITA HUNT | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEAN TONY BEAUMONT | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN AMANDA MCKINLAY | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERESA CHRISTINA TREWINNARD | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MARK ROSSER | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAIN EDWIN WHITLAM | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
MEG CAROLINE FROST | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL GEORGE IAN HUNT | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CORINNE JANE BRAID | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIE KATHRYN PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN PAUL GHINN | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WELCH ROBERTS BA OBE | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE ANNE SALMON | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR BILL KING BA, FRAES | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER COLIN RICKARD BSC, FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.