Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, EAST TWICKENHAM
Charity number: 1131378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Matthews | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Alison Mary Guy Purves | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Norman | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Myddelton | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wai Hing Chan | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shammah Banerjee | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Johnston | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Dixon | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Askwith | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zachary Alexander Jacka Jopling | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Sandford | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jovine Brearley Messer | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Pearman | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ross Yarrow | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stanley Wainer | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Victor Taylor | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Baird | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Parthina Gough | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||
MRS HELEN CHEN | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA MARY ASHTON-JENNINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WILLIAM PARISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY JOHN DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.