Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HALE
Charity number: 1130535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catriona Elizabeth Mary Barlow | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Moore | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Jane Davies | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Moore | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Barbara Jagger | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Christine Davison | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Nattrass | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Karen Janis Stanton | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Lesley Susan Bell | Trustee | 13 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Callum Charles Mitchell Bazley | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ELAINE ENGLISH | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Katharine Margaret Hass | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ALEXANDRA PARRY | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sidney Graham | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Shevaun Graham | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Julie Helen Withers | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN HUMPHREY MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL WINSTON DAVIES | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.