Governing document CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2014 as amended on 14 Oct 2019 as amended on 12 Apr 2021 as amended on 25 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.