Trustees NORTH REGION ATC SPORTS AND WELFARE FUND
Charity number: 500620
Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Irene Delaney | Chair | 23 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Harvey | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Jane Foster | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Terence Martin Baynes | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Thomas William Mabb | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Ian David Nesbitt | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Anthony William Andrews | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
GROUP CAPTAIN MARK DAVID LEEMING OBE | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Stuart John Ensor OBE | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Reginald Ellis | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.