Trustees POOLE BAY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1136518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
38 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANTONY JOHN CAVANAGH | Chair | 05 September 2012 |
|
|||||||
Dr Rebecca Thompson | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
David Kenneth Edward Downing | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Graham | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sylvia Elizabeth Kingston | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
DIANE BAGGS | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
EIFRON HOPPER | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Sarah Jayne Joy | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Gerald Peter Beddard | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Clarke Thompson | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Patricia Anne Fellows | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Terence Charles Fish | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Christina Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Deacon Gillian Margaret Judge | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Walter John Albert Beasley | Trustee | 12 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr David Julian Tawn | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Karen Elizabeth James | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Edwina Helen Gould | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Moira Ferguson Thompson | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DENISE ANNE GIBBS | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
ANTHONY JOSEPH FERNAND | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
LESLEY CAROL MARGARET FERNAND | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Christine Anne Snape | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Anita Mary Hazell | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Eileen McCormick | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Eileen Amy Osgood | Trustee | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ANN SARA HUGHES | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Sheilah Ann Goddard | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Roberto Viana | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Katrin Harwood | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Suzie Viana Deacon | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
JUDITH MARGARET HEWINS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
Christopher Denis Melhuish | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Clive John Allen | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rosalind Gladys Murray | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN MCCOY | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL GLASSEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.