Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY CLAPHAM, SOUTHWARK
Charity number: 1135242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAGO ROBERT OWEN WYNNE | Chair | 01 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev Felix Stevenson | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ed Veale | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Jones | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adwoa Boliston | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenny Dada | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wilson | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Calum Paradise | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Livi Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Gayle | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Katie Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
James White | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Colman | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Watling | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hellewell | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev JAMES ERIC JOHN MULVANEY | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Johnson | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN SIMON FLETCHER | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.