Trustees ANGLICAN PARISH CHURCHES FUND
Charity number: 1148066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Dana Delap | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Anthony Allwood | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abigail Lloyd | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Keith Halliday | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Deborah Dance | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Melanie Jane Allwood | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Liz Kitch | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Venerable William Edward Braviner | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr NIGEL WALTER | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
WENDY COOMBEY | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Ven Dr Anne Dawtry | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
LAURA MOFFATT | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr DAVID THACKRAY OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN BURTON MBE RIBA | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr JULIE BANHAM | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Venerable Robert Gerard Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jennifer Page | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
MATTHEW SAUNDERS MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Marcus Chantrey | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Geoffrey Rea Hunter | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.