Trustees DERBY BOOK FESTIVAL
Charity number: 1159763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH JANE FOTHERGILL CBE | Chair | 04 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Sarah Hindmarch | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Wall | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Keith Andrew John McLay | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Narinder Kumar Sharma | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Henshaw | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Fiona Mary Karen Apthorpe | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.