Trustees HOLME PIERREPONT CANOE CLUB
Charity number: 1162096
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAWN FRANCES SCOTT | Chair | 10 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Trevor Tarlton-Weatherall | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER NEWCOMBE | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Randall | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Good | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Guntrip | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beth Kirby | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steel | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN LAW | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN ALEXANDER SCOTT | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.