Trustees YORK NEIGHBOURS
Charity number: 1163768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Aitchison | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Barton | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Matthew Michael Nelson | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Jane Wheatley | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wilson | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Lis Ramage | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR WALTER TREVOR STOCKDALE MbChB | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.