Trustees PALMERS GREEN AND SOUTHGATE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1165425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Patricia Girling | Chair | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Stephen Howard | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Bleach | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edwin Holford | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Coral Vine Datta | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Halliday | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Davies | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DOROTHEA BRANDI | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Jennifer Somerville | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Howard Strudwick | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.