Trustees BREATHING SPACE, COVENTRY
Charity number: 1175896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crystal Joan Kofie | Chair | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gillham | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Clarke | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dagmer Dias | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Kirkman | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER SIDEBOTHAM | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sr Ann O'Sullivan | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lois Baldwin | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lindsey Lawn | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.