Trustees ST ANDREW'S CANTERBURY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1178344
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Bernard Fidder | Chair | 15 September 2018 |
|
|||||
VALERIE MARGARET CANNON | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Hollander | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET RUTH WILSON-SHARP | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ANNE CAMP | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET CHRISTINE ELISABETH WILSON-SHARP | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER HOLLANDER | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.