Trustees GLOBAL GIRL PROJECT
Charity number: 1184590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brita Fernandez Schmidt | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jabulisile Tugwana | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina de Souza | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Githinji | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Boag | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tina Chugani | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Chesterman | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Evette Franklin | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHNA PATEL | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.