Dogfen lywodraethu JAMES MARSHALL FOUNDATION CIO
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 05 DEC 2018 AMENDED ON 24 JUL 2020 as amended on 19 Aug 2021 as amended on 25 Nov 2021 as amended on 27 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance in life young people living in Harpenden, Wheathampstead, Redbourn, Markyate, Flamstead, Kimpton and East Hyde, who are under the age of 25 and in financial hardship by the provision of grants to assist with their education and career development with priority given to those aged 16 and over. In exceptional circumstances if necessary, priority will be given to those applicants living in Harpenden and Wheathampstead. '
Maes buddion
HARPENDEN, WHEATHAMPSTEAD, REDBOURN, MARKYATE, FLAMSTEAD, KIMPTON AND EAST HYDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.