Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KINVER
Charity number: 1192864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Anthony Clarkson | Chair | 09 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Marlene Ann Parsons | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jason Richard Content | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Drew | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Ann Williams | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Awkati | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Elizabeth Liffen | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
George William Barrow | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Harold Walters | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Harryman | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Ronald Middleton | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Mervin John Cutler | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lydia Rebecca Campbell | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Glenys Cutler | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Ian Charles Campbell | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.