Accounts and annual returns HEAL THE HEART
Charity number: 1186909
Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 37 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 37 days | |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 403 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 403 days | |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 768 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 768 days | |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 19 August 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window