Trustees FRIENDS OF THE IRONBRIDGE GORGE MUSEUM
Charity number: 518657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Waterson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin James | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Edwards | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR JIM CLARKE | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Farlow | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Stuart Walker | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sir Neil Cossons | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GLYN BOWEN | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Susan Tarr | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|||||
MR STEVE EVANS | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAY HARDMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
GERALDINE KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY WATERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.