Dogfen lywodraethu ST NICHOLAS HOSPITAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
HOSPITAL OF ST. NICHOLAS (SALISBURY) CHARITY SCHEME CONFIRMATION ACT 1959 AND SCHEME OF 7 MARCH 1961, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 15 JANUARY 2009 AND BY SCHEME DATED 26 APRIL 2016 as amended on 31 Jan 2019 as amended on 21 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE; (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AND FORMER RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO FORMER RESIDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED.
Maes buddion
SALISBURY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.