Dogfen lywodraethu WYCLIFFE COLLEGE (INCORPORATED)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/04/1931 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/1957 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/12/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: 1. TO PROVIDE A SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS, KNOWN AS WYCLIFFE COLLEGE AND FIRST FOUNDED IN THE YEAR 1882 BY THE LATE GEORGE WILLIAM SIBLY, MA AND TO DEVELOP AND EXTEND THE SAME. 2. TO ESTABLISH AND CARRY ON AT ANY PLACE OR PLACES WHICH MAY BE THOUGHT FIT ANY SUBSIDIARY, AFFILIATED OR OTHER SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE MENTIONED SCHOOL. 3. TO PROVIDE GENERAL INSTRUCTION AND EDUCATION FOR BOYS AND GIRLS TOGETHER WITH PHYSICAL AND MORAL TRAINING. 4. TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND SUBSIDISE BOARDING HOUSES FOR MASTERS, TEACHERS, STUDENTS, PUPILS AND OTHERS CONNECTED WITH OR ATTENDING SUCH SCHOOLS. 5. TO PROVIDE IN CONNECTION WITH ANY SCHOOL MAINTAINED BY THE CHARITY MEANS FOR TRAINING STUDENT TEACHERS AND STUDENTS IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STONEHOUSE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.