Dogfen lywodraethu LAMDA LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 20TH DECEMBER 1940 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06/02/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/02/2015 as amended on 21 Jun 2018 as amended on 24 Oct 2019 as amended on 13 Feb 2020 as amended on 23 Jul 2020 as amended on 18 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY MAINTAINING AND CARRYING ON A CONSERVATOIRE, ACADEMY, COLLEGE, HIGHER EDUCATION INSTITUTION, SCHOOL OR EXAMINATIONS BOARD IN LONDON, WITH BRANCHES IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE WHERE CHILDREN AND STUDENTS MAY RECEIVE A SOUND EDUCATION AND TUITION IN DRAMATIC ART, MUSIC AND ALL ITS BRANCHES, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED TRADES AND SKILLS, EMBRACING BOTH PRACTICE AND THEORY, AND SO FAR AS MAY BE NECESSARY FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSE IN LANGUAGES, AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE GIVING AND HOLDING OF LECTURES, PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS, CLASSES AND MEETINGS FOR THE PURPOSE AFORESAID, AND TO OFFER SCHOLARSHIPS, PRIZES, QUALIFICATIONS, CERTIFICATES AND MEDALS FOR THE PURPOSE AFORESAID.
Maes buddion
ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.