Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF LEWES VICTORIA HOSPITAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 7 MARCH 1966, AS AMENDED 29 MAY 1997, 27 MAY 1998, AND BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14 JULY 2004. AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 JUN 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO MOBILISE ENCOURAGE FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE LEWES VICTORIA HOSPITAL , AND LOCAL HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS THAT SUPPORT IT, BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE RULE 3 OF CONSTITUTION).
Maes buddion
THE HOSPITAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.