Trustees MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 254299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM MICHAEL HENWOOD | Chair | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Kevan Richard Lomas | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Lee Field | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Paul Earnshaw | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Donna Greatorex | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Thomas Joseph ROACH | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Anne Greaves | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
CARL RICHARD STOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
NICHOLAS GEORGE SEDGWICK | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.