Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL'S BOLDMERE
Charity number: 1128965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK LESLIE WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
PAMELA MAY BAXTER | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Brian Connell | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Anne Riley | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cheeran David | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edwina Mary Connell | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Tye | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Challa Brtton | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Gary Birchall | Trustee | 04 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER MALCOLM SWAINE | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELIZABETH PEEL B ED | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ELIZABETH HARRISON LLB | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SMOLDON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.