Trustees DENBIGH MISSION AREA
Charity number: 1186438
Charity reporting is up to date (129 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca-Elizabeth Margaret Sparey-Taylor | Chair | 26 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Parnell | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Legget-Jones | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Kath Mitchell-Dawson | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Sally Elizabeth Harper | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alyson Goldstein | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Williams | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bellis | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Finn | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Meredith-Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY-ANNE HENDERSON | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Griffiths | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angeline Margaret Frances Lawson BEM | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Joan Dunseath | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Needham | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norma Ann Rowles | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martin Pritchard MA | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Roger Charles Mullock | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY STEEL | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.