Accounts and annual returns PARKSIDE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1000887
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 25 November 2015 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 01 December 2015 | 31 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 25 March 2015 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 26 March 2015 | 146 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 26 March 2015 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 26 March 2015 | 511 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window