Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL DZOGCHEN COMMUNITY OF KUNSELLING
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 2 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 FEB 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE DZOGCHEN TEACHING AND PRACTICE IN ITS BUDDHIST AND BON FORMS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND TO PROMOTE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF ALL TIBETAN CULTURE AND TRADITIONS ACCORDING TO THE TEACHING AND SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF NAMKHAI NORBU RINPOCHE AND HIS NOMINATED SUCCESSORS
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.