Governing document SOUTH LAKES U3A
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/04/1992 AS AMENDED ON 02/09/1992 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/1993 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LAKES REGION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.