Dogfen lywodraethu ABERDARE TOWN CENTRE PROJECT/CHEQUERS YOUTH FACILITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 04/08/1997 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 20/08/2004 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF CYNON VALLEY BY HELPING AND EDUCATING SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUAL AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 2.TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A BUILDING OR BUILDINGS AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
BOUNDARIES OF BOROUGH OF CYNON VALLEY HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS CYNON VALLEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.